skip to content

LaRoche, Andre Michel

CPSO#: 87189

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:University of Sherbrooke, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 307
8333 Weston Road
Woodbridge ON  L4L 8E2
Phone: (905) 850-5556
Fax: (905) 850-5133 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Andre LaRoche Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 25 2018
Corporation Name: Andre LaRoche Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 25 2021
Corporation Name: Andre LaRoche Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 29 2021

Shareholders:
Dr. A. LaRoche ( CPSO# 87189 )

Business Address:
No business address available

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective:30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ANDRE MICHEL LAROCHE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAROCHE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 02 Aug 2013
CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012