skip to content

Woolford, Lorraine

CPSO#: 33002

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 15 Dec 1981
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 15 Dec 1981

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Trbovich, Lorraine (used until: 27 Mar 1983 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone: 905-813-1100 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Lorraine Woolford Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 10 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Woolford ( CPSO# 33002 )

Business Address:
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-2200

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 16 Nov 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. LORRAINE WOOLFORD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WOOLFORD is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Dec 1981
The CPSO will be closed for the statutory holiday on Monday, October 14, 2019. We will re-open at 8 a.m. on Tuesday, October 15.