skip to content

Vivas, Lilian Lee Yan

CPSO#: 100651

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 23 Nov 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 23 Nov 2020

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 408
2250 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 0W3
Phone: (905)497-1023
Fax: (905)497-1025 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Vivas Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 24 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Vivas ( CPSO# 98037 )
Dr. L. Vivas ( CPSO# 100651)

Business Address:
Brampton Civic Hospital
Division of General Internal Medicine
Room N2 880
2100 Boviard Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Business Address:
Toronto Rehabilitation Institute
Division of Physiatry
10th Floor
550 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2A2

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective:03 Sep 2020 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. LILIAN LEE YAN VIVAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VIVAS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 11 Mar 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 12 Mar 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 11 Mar 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 12 Mar 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 27 Aug 2018
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 28 Aug 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 27 Aug 2019
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 28 Aug 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 23 Nov 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Nov 2020