skip to content

Struzik, Lukasz

CPSO#: 84708

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 01 Jul 2008

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:University of Toronto, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 1
40 Innovation Drive
Vaughan ON  L4H 0T2
Phone: (905) 851-2444 Ext. 2
Fax: (905) 851-2412 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

3900 Rutherford Road
Woodbridge ON  L4H 3G8
Canada
Phone: (905) 417-5461
Fax: (416) 417-5463
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. L. Struzik Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 03 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Struzik ( CPSO# 84708 )

Business Address:
1 - 40 Innovation Drive
Vaughan ON  L4H 0T2
Phone Number: (905) 851-2444

Business Address:
3900 Rutherford Road
Woodbridge ON  L4H 3G8
Phone Number: (905) 417-5461

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. LUKASZ STRUZIK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STRUZIK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008