skip to content

Saffer, Linda Susan

CPSO#: 31590

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 26 May 1999
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 26 May 1999

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Cohen, Linda Susan (used until: 27 Apr 1999 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of the Witwatersrand Faculty, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ontario Telemedicine Network
438 University Ave #200,
Toronto ON  M5G 2K8
Phone: 6472837590 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Saffer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 09 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Saffer ( CPSO# 28170 )
Dr. L. Saffer ( CPSO# 31590 )

Business Address:
The Promenade
302 - 1 Promenade Circle
Thornhill ON  L4J 4P8
Phone Number: (905) 762-0525

Business Address:
28 Winborne Rd
Thornhill ON  L4J P8
Phone Number: 9057620525

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:09 Jun 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. LINDA SUSAN SAFFER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAFFER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 1977 to 30 Jun 1978
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1978 to 30 Jun 1979
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1979 to 30 Jun 1980
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 May 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 May 1999