skip to content

Rochon, Luc Joseph Wilfrid

CPSO#: 31955

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 23 Jul 1982
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 07 Jun 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1812 Appleford Street
Ottawa ON  K1K 4L2
Phone: (613) 762-5653 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Luc Rochon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 11 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Rochon ( CPSO# 31955 )

Business Address:
595 Chemin Montreal
Suite 403
Ottawa ON  K1K 4L2
Phone Number: (613) 745-8633

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Montfort Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1983 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 04 Dec 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. LUC JOSEPH WILFRID ROCHON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROCHON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 23 Jul 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jun 1984
Member Portal will be undergoing maintenance between 09:00 pm and 12:00 am on Thursday April 18, 2019. We apologize for the inconvenience.