skip to content

Neuendorff-el Helou, Luise

CPSO#: 99339

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 26 Nov 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 26 Nov 2020

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education: Ruprecht Karl Univ of Heidelberg, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
76 Grenville St
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone: 416 323 6400 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. el Helou Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 24 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. S. el Helou ( CPSO# 92597 )
Dr. L. Neuendorff-el Helou ( CPSO# 99339 )

Business Address:
McMaster University Children's Hospital
Department of Paediatrics
Neonatology Room 4F
1280 Main Street Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:11 Sep 2020 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. LUISE NEUENDORFF-EL HELOU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NEUENDORFF-EL HELOU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Sep 2012 to 23 Nov 2012
AVP - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 24 Nov 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 08 Apr 2018
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 09 Apr 2018 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2018 to 10 Apr 2019
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 11 Apr 2019 to 19 Apr 2019
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

University of Toronto, 02 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
CF - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2021 to 21 Sep 2021
CF - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Nov 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Nov 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Apr 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Jul 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 26 Nov 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Nov 2020