skip to content

Milot, Laurent

CPSO#: 86997

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 14 Dec 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 14 Dec 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Universite de Lyon I, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Laurent Milot Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 29 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Milot ( CPSO# 86997 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Medical Imaging
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6100

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 10 Sep 2007
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 11 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 14 Dec 2018