skip to content

Gilloteaux, Laurent Christophe

CPSO#: 81765

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 13 Mar 2006
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 13 Mar 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:NORTHEASTERN OHIO UNIVERSITIES, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UVM Health Network - CVPH
Radiology Department
75 Beekman Street
Plattsburgh, NY12901
Plattsburgh NY  12901
United States
Phone: (518) 562-7500

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Laurent Gilloteaux Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 26 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Gilloteaux ( CPSO# 81765 )

Business Address:
3000 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V2
Phone Number: (416) 438-6636

Business Address:
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Phone Number: (416) 431-8107


Corporation Name: Aziza Clemens Gilloteaux Kundu Shuckett Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 26 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Gilloteaux ( CPSO# 81765 )
Dr. M. Shoichet ( CPSO# 88856 )
Dr. B. Shuckett ( CPSO# 33666 )
Dr. R. Clemens ( CPSO# 50261 )
Dr. S. Kundu ( CPSO# 68121 )
Dr. J. Nazareno ( CPSO# 77684 )
Dr. B. Budisin ( CPSO# 77508 )
Dr. J. Woodley-Cook ( CPSO# 90936 )
Dr. J. Aziza ( CPSO# 54826 )

Business Address:
3000 Lawrence Avenue East
Suite G03
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V2
Phone Number: (416) 438-6636

Business Address:
3050 Lawrence Street East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Phone Number: (416) 431-8107

Business Address:
UVM Health Network-CVPH
Radiology Department
75 Beekman Street
Plattsburgh NY  129 1


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - California

USA - New York

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. LAURENT CHRISTOPHE GILLOTEAUX may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GILLOTEAUX is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 28 Jul 2004
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 28 Jul 2004
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 22 Jul 2005
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 28 Mar 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Mar 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Mar 2006
Member Portal will be undergoing maintenance between 09:00 pm and 12:00 am on Thursday April 18, 2019. We apologize for the inconvenience.