skip to content

Chalklin, Lori Whittington

CPSO#: 55848

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 1985
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 1988

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Caroline Medical Group
3305 Harvester Road
Units 15-20
Burlington ON  L7N 3N2
Phone: (905) 632-8007
Fax: (905) 681-6341 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Lori Chalklin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 28 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Chalklin ( CPSO# 55848 )

Business Address:
Caroline Medical Group
Units 15 - 20
3305 Harvester Road
Burlington ON  L7N 3N2
Phone Number: (905) 632-8007


Corporation Name: Chalklin Duncan Gallaccio Pintea Wallik Walsh Williams Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 28 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Wallik ( CPSO# 53982 )
Dr. L. Chalklin ( CPSO# 55848 )
Dr. G. Duncan ( CPSO# 66390 )
Dr. R. Williams ( CPSO# 73981 )
Dr. D. Pintea ( CPSO# 78124 )
Dr. A. Gallaccio ( CPSO# 82590 )
Dr. K. Walsh ( CPSO# 90905 )

Business Address:
Units 15 - 20
3305 Harvester Road
Burlington ON  L7N 3N2
Phone Number: (905) 632-8007

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:01 Jul 1987 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. LORI WHITTINGTON CHALKLIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHALKLIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1988