skip to content

Kyskan, Robert

CPSO#: 92634

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 31 Oct 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: The Ottawa Hospital 501 Smyth Road Ottawa, ON K1H 8L6
Date Received: 27 Apr 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective:07 Oct 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 12 Apr 2010 to 09 May 2010
EL - Respiratory Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jun 2013 to 21 Jun 2013
EL - Respiratory Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Nov 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Respirology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Oct 2014
CF - Respirology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Apr 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 May 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Oct 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015