skip to content

Kwong, Adrienne Yue-Ann

CPSO#: 91475

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 28 Aug 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Division of Palliative Care
The Ottawa Hospital- General Campus
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: 613-798-5555 Electoral District: 07

Additional Practice Location(s)

Montfort Hospital
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K0T2
Canada
Phone: 613-746-4621
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Adrienne Kwong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 03 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Kwong ( CPSO# 91475 )

Business Address:
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 798-5555

Business Address:
Montfort Hospital
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone Number: (613) 746-4621

Business Address:
43 Bruyere Street
Ottawa ON  K1N 5C8
Phone Number: (613) 562-6262

Business Address:
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 798-5555

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bruyere Continuing Care-Elisabeth Bruyere Site Ottawa
Montfort Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jul 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective:23 Sep 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ADRIENNE YUE-ANN KWONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KWONG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 02 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 03 Aug 2010 to 02 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 03 Aug 2011 to 30 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 31 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Critical Care Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Critical Care Medicine

University of Ottawa, 31 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Critical Care Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 25 Aug 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Critical Care Medicine

University of Ottawa, 21 Oct 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Palliative Care Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 19 Oct 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Palliative Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 2013