skip to content

Kwon, Sarah

CPSO#: 91454

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 18 Nov 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1333 Neilson Rd
Suite 100
Scarborough ON  M1B 4Y9
Phone: (416) 291-7719 Ext. 143
Fax: (416) 287-3775 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Bola/Kwon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 15 2019

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Bola ( CPSO# 88327 )
Dr. S. Kwon ( CPSO# 91454 )

Business Address:
302-1371 Neilson Road
Toronto ON  M1B 4Z8
Phone Number: (416) 281-1100

Business Address:
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone Number: (416) 813-5826

Business Address:
Markham Stouffville Hospital
381 Church Street
P O Box 1800
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone Number: (905) 471-7534

Business Address:
202-106 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 4E4
Phone Number: (416) 742-0580

Business Address:
306-1371 Neilsom Road
Toronto ON  M1B 4Z8
Phone Number: (416) 282-9119

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:31 Dec 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SARAH KWON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KWON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Respiratory Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Respiratory Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jan 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Respiratory Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Respiratory Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jan 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Respiratory Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Nov 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Respiratory Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Dec 2015 to 15 Dec 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Nov 2015