skip to content

Kwapisz, Lukasz

CPSO#: 97890

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 15 Dec 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
980 Oliver Rd
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone: (807) 684-6000 Electoral District: 09

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Texas

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:14 Dec 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. LUKASZ KWAPISZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KWAPISZ is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2012 to 03 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Western University, 04 Jun 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2013 to 03 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Western University, 04 Dec 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2014 to 03 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Western University, 04 Dec 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2015 to 14 Dec 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Gastroenterology

Western University, 15 Dec 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2016 to 14 Dec 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

Western University, 15 Dec 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

Western University, 01 Jul 2017 to 14 Dec 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Dec 2016