skip to content

Kwan, Christina Yee

CPSO#: 90740

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 15 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 15 Jul 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 216
1419 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Z7L6
Phone: 613 7226216
Fax: 6137222177 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Christina Y. Kwan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 21 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Kwan ( CPSO# 90740 )

Business Address:
Wellington Medical Clinic
1221 Wellington Street West
Ottawa ON  K1Y 2Z9
Phone Number: (613) 695-1221

Business Address:
Suite 216
1419 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Z L6
Phone Number: 6137226216

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:27 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CHRISTINA YEE KWAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KWAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 2011