skip to content

Kwan, Allison Katherine

CPSO#: 93151

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 26 May 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education: University of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
385 Silver Star Blvd
Suite 105
Scarborough ON  M1V 0E3
Phone: (416) 496-2228
Fax: (416) 496-2229 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

1440 Bathurst St.
Toronto ON  M5R 3J3
Canada
Phone: (416) 654-5437
Fax: (647) 689-2371
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Allison Kwan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 23 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Kwan ( CPSO# 93151 )

Business Address:
1440 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5R 3J3
Phone Number: (416) 654-5437

Business Address:
385 Silver Star Boulevard
Suite 105
Scarborough ON  M1V 0E3
Phone Number: (416) 496-2228

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Clinical Immunology and Allergy Effective:03 Oct 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ALLISON KATHERINE KWAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KWAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Clinical Immunology and Allergy

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Clinical Immunology and Allergy

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 May 2015