skip to content

Kurup, Lekha Macharivilakathu Gopinatha

CPSO#: 87051

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Macharivilakathu Gopinatha Kurup, Lekha (used until: 14 May 2012 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Malayalam, Tamil

Education:University of Kerala, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3200 Major Mackenzie Dr
Maple ON  L6A 4Z3
Phone: 9054172000 Ext. 7320 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Lekha Kurup Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 28 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Kurup ( CPSO# 87051 )

Business Address:
Mackenzie Health
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone Number: (905) 883-1212

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. LEKHA MACHARIVILAKATHU GOPINATHA KURUP may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KURUP is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 22 Sep 2007
AVP - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011