skip to content

Kurukula Arachchi, Sandhya Pushpalatha

CPSO#: 85746

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 15 Dec 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 15 Dec 2008

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Sinhalese

Education:University of Peradeniya, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Grace Medical Clinic
1070 Gainsborough Road
London ON  N6H 5L5
Phone: (519) 850-8774
Fax: (519) 850-8775 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. S. Kurukula Arachchi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 17 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Kurukula Arachchi ( CPSO# 85746 )

Business Address:
Grace Medical Clinic
1070 Gainsborough Road
London ON  N6H 5L5
Phone Number: (519) 850-8774

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:10 Dec 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SANDHYA PUSHPALATHA KURUKULA ARACHCHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KURUKULA ARACHCHI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Nov 2006 to 20 Jan 2007
AVP - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 21 Jan 2007 to 31 Oct 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Nov 2007 to 31 Oct 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Jan 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Dec 2008