skip to content

Kuritzky, Lara Alexandra

CPSO#: 90823

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 28 Dec 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 28 Dec 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 28 Dec 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 28 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 29 Dec 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 28 Dec 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Dec 2015