Concerns
Source:
FSMB (USA)
Notice Type Jurisdiction Notices
Active Date: October 18, 2018
Summary:
Where a disciplinary finding is made against a member on or after September 1, 2015 by a medical regulatory or licensing authority in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, the College By-laws require certain information about the finding to be posted on the register, if the finding is known to the College.
The following are non-Ontario disciplinary findings made against this member, as known to the College, together with the corresponding information:
On October 18, 2018, the Medical Board of California, with the agreement of Dr. Manzar Sarfaraz Kuraishi, made an order effective November 16, 2018 staying an order of revocation of Dr. Kuraishi’s licence and placing him on probation for three years. The terms of the probation ordered by the Medical Board of California include requirements to successfully complete approved educational programs and courses, practice under an approved practice monitor or participate in a professional enhancement program, and not supervise physician assistants or advanced practice nurses. This order was made as a result of allegations of gross negligence, repeated negligent acts, incompetence, repeated acts of excessive prescribing and inadequate and/or inaccurate record-keeping in connection with his care and treatment of a patient, and allegations of aiding and abetting a medical assistant to practice medicine without a license, failure to supervise a medical assistant, and unprofessional conduct, all of which are causes for discipline under the California Business and Professions Code. The College was notified of this finding by a report dated October 25, 2018.
Source:
Member
Active Date: February 7, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Manzar Sarfaraz Kuraishi to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective February 7, 2017:
Dr. Kuraishi has voluntarily ceased to practise medicine in Ontario and therefore cannot see any patients or provide any medical advice or services.