skip to content

Kuprowski, Gary Nicholas

CPSO#: 28227

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Sep 2021
EXPIRY DATE
02 Sep 2021
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 16 Jun 1976

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Gary Kuprowski Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 17 2021

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Patients seeking access to a copy of their medical record can contact Dr. Armin Mulaosmanovic: 3335 Dougall Ave., Suite 103A, Windsor, ON., N9E 1S8, Telephone: 519-969-0580
Date Received: 03 Nov 2020


Address: Patients should contact the following address to request a copy of their file: 600 Norfolk Street, Windsor ON, N9E 1H1, Ph (519) 969-0580, Fax (519) 966-1901
Date Received: 16 Oct 2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Sep 2021