skip to content

Kupferszmidt, Irene

CPSO#: 13337

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 20 Jun 2000
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 20 Jun 2000

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Russian

Education:First Moscow Order of Lenin Medical Inst, 1944

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1975 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jan 1951
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 17 Jul 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Nov 1990
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 20 Jun 2000