skip to content

Kumbharathi, Ravi Babu

CPSO#: 87417

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Feb 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 01 Feb 2019
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dr. N.T.R University of Health Sciences, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective:05 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 27 Aug 2007
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 28 Aug 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Feb 2019

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Feb 2019 Active
             Dr. Ravi Babu Kumbharathi may practise medicine independently in
            anesthesiology, only.