skip to content

Kumar Tyagi, Nidhi

CPSO#: 96147

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 03 Apr 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland Sch, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Juravinski Cancer Centre
699 Concession St 3rd floor
Hamilton ON  L8V 5C2
Phone: (905) 387-9495 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Kumar Tyagi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 2 2021

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective:27 Sep 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. NIDHI KUMAR TYAGI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KUMAR TYAGI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 23 Sep 2011
AVP - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Clinician Investigator

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
CF - Clinician Investigator

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Apr 2019