skip to content

Kumar, Sunil

CPSO#: 92162

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Nov 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 30 Nov 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Agra University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2009 to 09 Dec 2009
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neurology

University of Toronto, 10 Dec 2009 to 30 Nov 2010
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 05 Oct 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Dec 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Nov 2010