skip to content

Kumar, Ritesh

CPSO#: 91601

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Sep 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 02 Aug 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective:30 Jun 2019 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Clinician Investigator

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 7 - Clinician Investigator

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 8 - Clinician Investigator

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 Aug 2017
PostGrad Yr 9 - Clinician Investigator

University of Ottawa, 01 Sep 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 9 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 9 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 19 Aug 2019 to 31 Oct 2019
CF - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 2019
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Sep 2020