skip to content

Kumar, Kamal

CPSO#: 96989

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 25 Jul 2014
EXPIRY DATE
30 Jun 2021
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 25 Jul 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Mysore University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LHSC Victoria Hospital
Department of Anesthesia and
Perioperative Medicine
C2-168, 800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 55115 Electoral District: 02

Additional Practice Location(s)

St. Joseph's Health Care London
68 Grosvenor St, London, ON
London ON  N6A 4V2
Canada
Phone: (519) 646-6100
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Kamal Kumar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 23 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Kumar ( CPSO# 96989 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
University Hospital-Room C3-108
Department of Anesthesia and Perioperative Medicin
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Business Address:
London Health Science Centre
Department of Anesthesia
Victoria Hospital
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Business Address:
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone Number: (519) 646-6100


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



India

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective:25 Jul 2014 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 28 Oct 2011 to 21 Dec 2011
PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology

Western University, 22 Dec 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Anesthesiology

Western University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Anesthesiology

Western University, 01 Jul 2013 to 28 Jun 2014
CF - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 27 Oct 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Dec 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 25 Jul 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 02 Feb 2017
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2021

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 31 Jan 2020 Active
             1.    Dr. Kamal Kumar may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of
                        Anaesthesia & Perioperative Medicine, University of Western
                        Ontario, in which Dr. Kumar holds an academic appointment at the
                        rank of Assistant Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from
                  the date of issuance or when Dr. Kumar  no longer holds the academic
                  appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the College receives a report indicating that Dr. Kumar's clinical
                        performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or
                        academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. Kumar's certificate
                        of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment
                        report. 
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued on July 25, 2014, and expires on June 30,
                  2021.  Upon renewal of Dr. Kumar's academic appointment at the University
                  of Western Ontario, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the
                  limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.