skip to content

Kumar, Gautam

CPSO#: 85304

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 14 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 14 Jul 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
NEO Kids Building
Health Sciences North
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone: (705) 523-7120
Fax: (705) 523-8600 Electoral District: 08

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Gautam Kumar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 22 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Kumar ( CPSO# 85304 )

Business Address:
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. GAUTAM KUMAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KUMAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 2010