skip to content

Kumar, Ganraj

CPSO#: 19675

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 02 Aug 1984
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 02 Aug 1984

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:McGill University, 1961

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 9
2901 Markham Rd,
Scarborough ON  M1X 0B6
Phone: 416 538 0707
Fax: 416 538 0700 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Trinity Medical Imaging/ Cardiology
1255 The Queensway Unit 16A
Etobicoke, ON: M8Z 1S1
Toronto ON  M8Z 1S1
Canada
Phone: (416) 253-5111
Fax: (416) 253-5112
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

4515 Ebenezer Road Unit 113
Brampton ON  L6P 2K7
Canada
Phone: 905 794 4088
Fax: 905 794 4259
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

2318 Lakeshore Blvd West,
Lower Level
Etobicoke
Toronto ON  M8V 1B5
Canada
Phone: 416 901 9729
Fax: 647 340 3001
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

1145 Sheppard & Morningside
Toronto ON  L4B 1L5
Canada
Phone: 1 877 718 2196
Fax: 877 718 0283
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

3227 EGLINGTON AVE EAST,
Toronto ON  M1J 3M5
Canada
Phone: 647 864 7490
Fax: 647 864 7490
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

180 SANDALWOOD PARKWAY E #F1
Brampton ON  L6Z 1Y4
Canada
Phone: 647 261 2273
Fax: 647 793 8384
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Ganraj Kumar, Medicine, Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 16 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Kumar ( CPSO# 19675 )

Business Address:
113 - 4515 Ebenezer Road
Brampton ON  L6P 2K7

Business Address:
12637 Thenth Line
Stouffville ON  L3B 1A8

Business Address:
9 - 2901 Markham Road
Scarborough ON  M1X 0B6
Phone Number: (416) 538-0707

Business Address:
2318 Lakeshore Boulevard West
Lower Level
Etobicoke ON  M8V 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 901-9729

Business Address:
1278 The Queensway
Etobicoke ON  M8Z 1S3

Business Address:
Suite 16A
1255 The Queensway
Etobicoke ON  M8Z 1S1
Phone Number: (416) 253-5111

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:16 Nov 1966 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. GANRAJ KUMAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KUMAR is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Aug 1965
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 25 Mar 1969
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 1984