skip to content

Kumar, David Vijay

CPSO#: 93894

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 15 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 15 Jul 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Telugu

Education:Kurnool Medical College, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Joseph Regional Health Center
2801 Franciscan Dr.
Bryan TX  77802
United States
Phone: (979) 776-3777

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: David Kumar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 12 2017

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Texas

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:15 Jan 2010 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Jul 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Jul 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 14 Jan 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Mar 2012
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 09 Mar 2012

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 09 Mar 2012 Active
 Dr. David Vijay Kumar may practise medicine independently in Internal Medicine,
            only.