Kumar, Cauhalagala Lakshmanasetty Prasanna (CPSO#: 23759)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Feb 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Feb 2018

Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Kannada, Telugu

Education:Mysore University, 1961

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Records Management Ltd 13-1 High Meadow Place Toronto ON M9L 0A3 Tel: 1-(800)-775-0093 Fax: 1-(888)-316-4125 Website: www.recordsregistry.ca
Date Received: 23 Oct 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 02 Dec 1970 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Feb 2018

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: Member
Active Date: December 10, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Cauhalagala Lakshmanasetty Prasanna Kumar to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective December 10, 2018:

College investigations were conducted into whether Dr. Kumar engaged in professional misconduct and/or was incompetent in his obstetrical/gynaecological practice.

In the face of these allegations, Dr. Kumar resigned from the College on February 1, 2018 and has agreed never to apply or re- apply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.
Download Full Document (PDF)