skip to content

Kumar, Brinda Cauhalagala Prasanna

CPSO#: 29373

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 24 Jul 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 24 Jul 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Kannada, Tamil, Telugu

Education:Mysore University, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Suite 401 4430 Bathurst Street Downsview, ON M3H 3S3
Date Received: 24 Jul 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Nov 1970
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 May 1971
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1971
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 Oct 1971
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jan 1973
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Feb 1974
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 24 Jul 2015