Kulkarni, Jyothi (CPSO#: 99546)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Feb 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Feb 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Kannada, Marathi, Telugu

Education:Kakatiya Medical College, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Stratford Family Health Team
Stratford ON  N5A 0E6
Phone: (519) 508-7029
Fax: (519) 508-7031
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ram Gobburu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 11 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Gobburu ( CPSO# 99011 )
Dr. J. Kulkarni ( CPSO# 99546 )

Business Address:
Jenny Trout Centre
Suite 113
342 Erie Street
Stratford ON  N5A 2N4
Phone Number: (519) 272-2040


Corporation Name: Jyothi Kulkarni Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 28 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Kulkarni ( CPSO# 99546 )

Business Address:
444 Douro Street
Stratford ON  N5A 0E6
Phone Number: (519) 508-7029

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

India
United Kingdom

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 11 Jan 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JYOTHI KULKARNI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KULKARNI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 19 Oct 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 19 Oct 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 01 Jan 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Jun 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 27 Mar 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 05 Feb 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Feb 2015