skip to content

Kulisiewicz, Gawel Tomasz

CPSO#: 89521

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 23 Jan 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 24 Oct 2008

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Sydney, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2008 to 23 Sep 2008
PEAP - CF - Orthopedic Surgery

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 24 Sep 2008 to 23 Jan 2009
CF - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Sep 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Jan 2009