skip to content

Kulik, Dina Michelle

CPSO#: 86439

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 31 Dec 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kidcrew
1440 Bathurst St
Toronto ON  M5R 3J3
Phone: (416) 6545437
Fax: 647-689-2371 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Kulik Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 28 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Kulik ( CPSO# 86439 )

Business Address:
1440 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5R 3J3
Phone Number: (416) 654-5437

Business Address:
The Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Paediatrics
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone Number: (416) 813-1500


Corporation Name: Dr. Dina Kulik Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 20 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Kulik ( CPSO# 86439 )

Business Address:
Kidcrew
1440 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5R 3J3
Phone Number: (416) 654-5437

Business Address:
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone Number: (416) 813-5550

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:31 Dec 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Pediatric Emergency Medicine Effective:28 Feb 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DINA MICHELLE KULIK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KULIK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Aug 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 12 Aug 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Dec 2011