skip to content

Kukreti, Vinay

CPSO#: 92068

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 17 Sep 2014
EXPIRY DATE
15 Mar 2022
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 17 Sep 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Marathi, Urdu

Education:Gorakhpur University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lakeridge Health
Department of Pediatrics
1 Hospital Crt
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone: (905) 576-8711 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

2101-222 Kings St. East
Bowmanville ON  L1C 1P6
Canada
Phone: 9056979770
Fax: 9056976452
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. V. Kukreti and Dr. D. Mankad Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 13 2021

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:17 Sep 2014 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Sep 2009 to 09 Oct 2009
PEAP - CF - Paediatric Critical Care

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 10 Oct 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Paediatric Critical Care

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Paediatric Critical Care

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Paediatric Critical Care

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 03 Sep 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Oct 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Jul 2021
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration Expiry Date: 15 Mar 2022

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: July 16, 2021
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Vinay Kukreti to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective July 16, 2021:

A College investigation was conducted into the care Dr. Kukreti provided in his pediatric practice. As a result of the investigation:

Dr. Kukreti will engage in professional education in the areas of renal tumor, anchoring bias and diagnostic errors.