skip to content

Kuhnel, Stefanie Peggy

CPSO#: 97458

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 01 Sep 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 25 Jun 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Ludwig Maximilian University at Munich, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Apr 2012 to 24 Jun 2012
PEAP - CF - Orthopedic Surgery

Western University, 25 Jun 2012 to 31 Mar 2013
CF - Orthopedic Surgery

Western University, 01 Apr 2013 to 01 Sep 2013
CF - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 24 Apr 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Sep 2013