skip to content

Kuhlmann, John Christian

CPSO#: 26815

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 30 Jul 1974
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jul 1974

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
666 Burnhamthorpe Road
Suite 202
Etobicoke ON  M9C 2Z4
Phone: (416) 622-0933
Fax: (416) 622-0409 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

2065 Finch Avenue West
Suite 309
North York ON  M3N 1W8
Canada
Phone: 416 507 6442
Fax: 416 391 6112
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. John Kuhlmann Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 31 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Kuhlmann ( CPSO# 26815 )

Business Address:
202 - 666 Burnhamthorpe Road
Etobicoke ON  M9C 2Z4
Phone Number: (416) 622-0933

Business Address:
2065 Finch Avenue West
Suite 309
North York ON  M3N 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 507-6442


Corporation Name: J. Kuhlmann Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 18 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Kuhlmann ( CPSO# 26815 )

Business Address:
309 - 2065 Finch Avenue West
North York ON  M3N 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 507-6442

Business Address:
666 Burnhamthorpe Road
Suite 202
Etobicoke ON  M9C 2Z4
Phone Number: (416) 622-0933

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JOHN CHRISTIAN KUHLMANN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KUHLMANN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 1974