skip to content

Kuhl, Andrew Gordon

CPSO#: 90504

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1800 8th Street
Owen Sound ON  N4K 6M9
Phone: (519) 376-2121 Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Andrew G. Kuhl Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 15 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Kuhl ( CPSO# 90504 )

Business Address:
1800 8th Street East
Owen Sound ON  N4K 6M9
Phone Number: (519) 376-2121

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound Owen Sound

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective:27 Sep 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ANDREW GORDON KUHL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KUHL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 7 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2016

Concerns

Source: Other
Active Date: September 24, 2020
Expiry Date:
Summary:
FINDINGS OF GUILT
Andrew Kuhl was found guilty of the following offence:

Having over 80 mg blood alcohol concentration within two hours after ceasing to operate a conveyance, contrary to Section 320.14(1)(b) of the Criminal Code of Canada.

Date: September 24, 2020
Sentence: 1 year driving prohibition; Fine of $2000