skip to content

Kudlow, Paul Adam

CPSO#: 100691

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013
EXPIRY DATE
30 Jun 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 07 Jun 2016
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University of Toronto
Department of Psychiatry
8th Floor
250 College Street
Toronto ON  M5T 1R8
Phone: (416) 979-6911 Electoral District: 10

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 Jun 2016
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 07 Jun 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2017
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 05 Jul 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2020

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
member Effective: 29 Apr 2019 Active
             As from July 5, 2016, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Paul Adam Kudlow, in
            accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Kudlow to the College
            of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                               UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                            ("Undertaking")

                                                  of

                                         DR. PAUL ADAM KUDLOW
                                            ("Dr. Kudlow")

                                                  to

                             COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                            (the "College")



            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   I, Dr. Kudlow, certificate of registration number 100691, am a member of
                  the College. 

            (2)   I, Dr. Kudlow, acknowledge that on September 16 and October 20, 2014, I
                  provided medical notes written on University Health Network letterhead to
                  a friend, excusing him from his academic responsibilities. I acknowledge
                  that I was not this individual's physician and that the use of University
                  Health Network letterhead was unauthorized and inappropriate.

            (3)   I, Dr. Kudlow, acknowledge that as a result of my actions in providing
                  these medical notes, I am required to participate in a remediation
                  program directed by the Faculty of Medicine at the University of Toronto
                  (the "Remediation Program"). The Remediation Program will take place over
                  a period of two (2) years.

            (4)   I, Dr. Kudlow, acknowledge that the College became aware of the above
                  incidents on April 30, 2015, when I answered "Yes" to Question C (1B) on
                  my PGE Renewal Report. I acknowledge that as a result, I am currently the
                  subject of a College investigation bearing File Number 7214943 (the
                  "Investigation").

            (5)   I, Dr. Kudlow, acknowledge that, after receiving an original copy of this
                  Undertaking as signed by me, the College will take no further action on
                  the Investigation.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (6)   I, Dr. Kudlow, understand and agree that I am bound by this Undertaking
                  from the date on which I sign it until my completion of the Remediation
                  Program. 

            (7)   I, Dr. Kudlow, acknowledge that I have provided the College with a copy
                  of the Remediation Program, dated August 10, 2015. I undertake to provide
                  the College with any revisions or addendums to the Remediation Program
                  which may arise before my completion thereof.

            (8)   I, Dr. Kudlow, confirm that I have completed one year of the Remediation
                  Program and have provided the College with all interim and final
                  report(s) in my possession. I further confirm that, effective July 1,
                  2016, my status in the PGY2 Psychiatry program at the University of
                  Toronto will be changed to "Leave of Absence Without Pay". In
                  anticipation of this change, the Board of Examiners of Postgraduate
                  Programs at the University amended my remediation schedule such that the
                  second year of the Remediation Program will be completed upon my return
                  to PGY2 rotations. The date of my return is currently unknown.

            (9)   I, Dr. Kudlow, acknowledge that my earliest approximate return date to
                  the PGY2 Psychiatry program is three (3) to five (5) years from the date
                  of this Undertaking. I further acknowledge that I am not currently in a
                  position to provide an exact return date or to confirm that I will be
                  returning to the program in the future. I undertake to advise the College
                  of my return to the PGY2 Psychiatry program or of any final decision not
                  to return to the program.

            (10)  I, Dr. Kudlow, undertake to complete the Remediation Program.

            (11)  I, Dr. Kudlow, undertake to provide the College with all interim and
                  final report(s) produced during the Remediation Program, save and except
                  those already provided. I acknowledge that the report(s) may form the
                  basis of further action by the College. I further acknowledge that this
                  Undertaking and all reports produced during the Remediation Program will
                  be provided to the Registration Department of the College and may be
                  considered in any future application for registration, including
                  subsequent applications for an independent practice certificate and/or
                  renewal of postgraduate certificates.

            (12)  I, Dr. Kudlow, acknowledge and agree that, upon receipt by the College of
                  confirmation of my final decision not to return to the PGY2 program and
                  the expiry of my certificate of registration, this Undertaking will be
                  deemed satisfied and any outstanding terms will be of no force and
                  effect.

            (13)  I, Dr. Kudlow, undertake to comply with this Undertaking and acknowledge
                  that a breach by me of any provision of this Undertaking may constitute
                  an act of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and may result in
                  a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline Committee of the
                  College.

            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (14)  I, Dr. Kudlow, acknowledge that I shall be solely responsible for payment
                  of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the
                  implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking. 

            (15)  I, Dr. Kudlow, acknowledge and confirm that I have read and understand
                  the provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent
                  legal counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived
                  my right to do so.

            (16)  I, Dr. Kudlow, acknowledge that this entire Undertaking constitutes
                  terms, conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for
                  the purposes of section 23 of the Code. I understand that this
                  Undertaking shall be information on the College's Register that is
                  available to the public during the time period that the Undertaking
                  remains in effect.

            (17)  I, Dr. Kudlow, acknowledge that the following summary will appear on the
                  College's Register that is available to the public during the time period
                  that this Undertaking remains in effect:

                        Dr. Kudlow is subject to the following terms, conditions, and
                        limitations on his certificate of registration:
                  
                        *     Dr. Kudlow will complete a Remediation Program directed by
                              the Faculty of Medicine at the University of Toronto, and
                              will provide the College with all interim and final report(s)
                              produced during the Remediation.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (18)  I, Dr. Kudlow, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide any
                  information it deems necessary to any person, organization or institution
                  who requests or requires this information for the purposes of
                  facilitating or verifying my compliance with this Undertaking. 

            (19)  I, Dr. Kudlow, give my irrevocable consent to any person who facilitates
                  or verifies my compliance with this Undertaking, to disclose to the
                  College any information:

                  (a)   relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this
                        Undertaking; and/or  
                  
                  (c)   which comes to his or her attention and which he or she reasonably
                        believes indicates a potential risk of harm to my patients.
                  
                  
            The certificate of registration held by Dr. Paul Adam Kudlow carries an expiry
            date and also carries the following terms, conditions and limitations,
            permitting postgraduate medical training, subject to the terms of his
            undertaking above and return from leave of absence:

            (1) Dr. PAUL ADAM KUDLOW shall practise medicine only as required by the
            postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. KUDLOW is enrolled at
            UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO; 

            (2) Dr. KUDLOW shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a
            clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where
            Dr. KUDLOW is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees
            are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate
            medical education; 

            (3) Dr. KUDLOW shall not charge a fee for medical services; 

            (4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr.
            KUDLOW is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education
            provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. KUDLOW no longer holds
            Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment
            authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada). 

            Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2020.

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: Member
Active Date: June 7, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Paul Adam Kudlow to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective June 7, 2016:

Dr. Kudlow is subject to the following terms, conditions, and limitations on his certificate of registration:

• Dr. Kudlow will complete a Remediation Program directed by the Faculty of Medicine at the University of Toronto, and will provide the College with all interim and final report(s) produced during the Remediation.