Kuchinad, Anil (CPSO#: 99399)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
12 Elliot Street
Perth ON  K7H 3A3
Phone: (613) 267-1660
Fax: (613) 201-5706
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kuchinad Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 18 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Kuchinad ( CPSO# 99399 )

Business Address:
The Elliot Street Clinic
12 Elliot Street
Perth ON  K7H 3A3
Phone Number: (613) 267-1660

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital,Great War Memorial Site-Perth Perth

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANIL KUCHINAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KUCHINAD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 24 Sep 2012 to 21 Oct 2012
Elective Trainee - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Oct 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2013