skip to content

Kucher, Brandon Matthew

CPSO#: 87015

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 27 Sep 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Sep 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
955 Queen St E
Sault Ste. Marie ON  P6A 2C3
Phone: 7054503200
Fax: 7055758890 Electoral District: 08

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Kucher Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 26 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Kucher ( CPSO# 87015 )

Business Address:
955 Queen St E
Sault Ste. Marie ON  P6A 2C3
Phone Number: 7054503200

Business Address:
25 Woodhurst Drive
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6C 5Z5

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Patients seeking to access their medical record may contact RSRS at 1-888-563-3732
Date Received: 27 Jul 2018


Instructions: Patients seeking to access their medical record may contact RSRS at 1-888-563-3732 ext. 221
Date Received: 22 Jun 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective:26 Aug 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. BRANDON MATTHEW KUCHER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KUCHER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 26 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

McMaster University, 27 Aug 2010 to 26 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

McMaster University, 27 Aug 2011 to 26 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Aug 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Sep 2012