skip to content

Krysko, Kristen Marie

CPSO#: 98179

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 15 Jun 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 15 Jun 2020

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University Of Toronto, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michael's Hospital
Division of Neurology
30 Bond St
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-5377
Fax: (416) 864-5378 Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective:30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KRISTEN MARIE KRYSKO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KRYSKO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 2020