skip to content

Krupa, Norman Kenneth

CPSO#: 29882

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 21 Mar 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 06 May 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University Of Toronto, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Norman Krupa Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 15 2016

Medical Records Location

Address: Records Storage & Retrieval Services Tel: 1-888-563-3732 ext. 1 Website: www.rsrs.com
Date Received: 13 Mar 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 May 1978
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 May 2015
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 06 May 2015
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 21 Mar 2017