skip to content

Kruisselbrink, Richelle Brenda Joy

CPSO#: 88904

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 26 Jul 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 4K9
Phone: 519-742-3611 Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Richelle Kruisselbrink Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 22 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Kruisselbrink ( CPSO# 88904 )

Business Address:
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound Owen Sound
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective:30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. RICHELLE BRENDA JOY KRUISSELBRINK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KRUISSELBRINK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 May 2014
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 08 Dec 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 08 Dec 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jul 2013