skip to content

Kruba, Richard Michael

CPSO#: 94590

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 02 Nov 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 02 Nov 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:Poznan University of Medical Sciences, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Windsor Regional Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Phone: (519) 254-5577 Ext. 52201 Electoral District: 01

Additional Practice Location(s)

1453 Prince Road
Windsor ON  N9C3Z4
Canada
Phone: (519) 257-5111 Ext. 77801
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Richard Kruba Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 01 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Kruba ( CPSO# 94590 )

Business Address:
Windsor Regional Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Phone Number: (519) 254-5577

Business Address:
Windsor Regional Hospital
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Phone Number: (519) 973-4411

Business Address:
1453 Prince Rd
Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare
Windsor ON  N9C 3Z4


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare,Tayfour Campus Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective:02 Nov 2010 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 Nov 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 02 Nov 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 01 May 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Apr 2012
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 11 Apr 2012

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 11 Apr 2012 Active
 Dr.   Richard   Michael   Kruba   may   practise   medicine   independently  in
            Anaesthesiology, only.