skip to content

Kronick, Sydney

CPSO#: 12511

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2011

Summary

Date of Death: 26-Jan-2019

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 1947

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Dr. Kronick's medical records are being stored by: Appletree Medical Centre 1580 Merivale Road Ottawa, Ontario K2G 4B5
Date Received: 30 Jun 2011

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 01 Jan 1952 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Nov 1947
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2011