skip to content

Kronick, Stanley Harris

CPSO#: 23842

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 13 Jul 1971
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 13 Jul 1971

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Apple Tree Clinic
225 Preston Street
Ottawa ON  K1R 7R1
Phone: (613) 288-0279
Fax: (613) 288-2442 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Stanley Kronick Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 10 2018

Medical Records Location

Address: Apple Tree Clinic 225 Preston St Ottawa ON K1R 7R1 613-288-0279
Instructions: Patients who are looking to obtain a copy of their record should contact the address or phone number above.
Date Received: 27 Apr 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 01 Jan 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. STANLEY HARRIS KRONICK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KRONICK is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 24 May 1972
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1976