skip to content

Kroach, Murray Norman

CPSO#: 19927

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 24 Jun 1966
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 1966

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Kroch, Murray Norman (used until: 30 Nov 1989 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education: University of Toronto, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Kroach Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 16 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Kroach ( CPSO# 19927 )

Business Address:
Multispecialty Medical Clinic
21 Queensway West
Suite 111
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B6
Phone Number: (905) 897-0788

Business Address:
Toronto East General Hospital
825 Coxwell Avenue
East York ON  M4C 3E7
Phone Number: (416) 461-8272

Business Address:
6 - 3400 Danforth Road East
Toronto ON  M1L 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 693-3030

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Patients who are requesting their medical record transfer before May 2022 may contact the Danforth Avenue clinic location at: 6-3400 Danforth Ave, Toronto, ON, M1L 1E1, Phone: 416- 693-3030, Fax: 416-693-3033. Patients requesting a medical record after May 2022 should contact Docudavit Medical Solutions via telephone at: 416-781-9083 or 1-888-781-9083.
Date Received: 02 Feb 2022

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective:15 Nov 1971 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MURRAY NORMAN KROACH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KROACH is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1965
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1966
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1966