Kristof, Lorand (CPSO#: 97745)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Apr 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Apr 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Medicine and Pharmacy, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Wise Elephant Family Health Team
2 Kennedy Rd. South, Unit 4
Brampton ON  L6W 3E1
Phone: (905) 459-4385
Fax: 905-459-6373
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

25 Gateway Blvd.
Brampton ON  L6T 4X2
Canada
Phone: (289) 323-0660
Fax: 905-459-6373
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Gateway Medical Clinic
25 Gateway Blvd.
Brampton ON  L6T 4X2
Canada
Phone: (289) 323-0660
Fax: 905-459-6373
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

William Osler Health System
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Canada
Phone: (905) 494-2120
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Malton Village LTC
7075 Rexwood Road
Mississauga ON  L4T 2W2
Canada
Phone: (905) 791-1179
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Lorand Kristof Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 18 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Kristof ( CPSO# 97745 )

Business Address:
William Osler Health System
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Business Address:
Gateway Medical Clinic
25 Gateway Boulevard
Brampton ON  L6T 4X2

Business Address:
Malton Village LTC
7075 Rexwood Road
Mississauga ON  L4T 2W2
Phone Number: (905) 791-1179

Business Address:
Wise Elephant Family Health Team
Unit 4
2 Kennedy Road South
Brampton ON  L6W 3E1

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 13 Jan 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LORAND KRISTOF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KRISTOF is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Dec 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 08 Apr 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Apr 2014